Case: 10-09-00086-CR
10-09-00086-CR
03/23/2009
Solicitation of a Child
Timothy Edward Shaffer
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
04/08/2009
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/2011 | Letter issued by the court | | |
04/08/2009 | Case stored | | |
04/08/2009 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/06/2009 | Docketing statement filed | | |
03/23/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |
03/09/2009 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/08/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State of | Criminal - State of Texas | Laurence Chambless Dale S. Hanna |
Shaffer, Timothy Edward | Appellant | Shelly D. Fowler Timothy Edward Shaffer |
Trial Court Information
249th District Court
Johnson
Honorable D. Wayne Bridewell
F43355