judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE:ESTATE OF ISAAC H. DUPREE; EDNA ELIZABETH DUPREE,APLT

Case Information: 10-PR-0897
Short Caption:IN RE:ESTATE OF ISAAC H. DUPREE; EDNA ELIZABETH DUPREE,APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM46-09Filed Date:05/03/2010

Opening Event Date:05/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdna Elizabeth Dupree N
William E. Seals NN
AppellantEstate of Isaac H. DupreeN
William E. Seals NN
AppelleeVictoria A. Ward NPro SeN
AppelleeIsaac Henry Dupree NPro SeN
AppelleeDavid Dupree NPro SeN
AppelleeCurtis Carlos Dupree NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (RECEIVED)
09/02/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as counsel has not IDENTIFIED AN APPEALABLE ORDER. See Patterson v. DC, No. 08-CV-189 (DC May 6, 2010);... It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall further SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING. See Valentine v. Elliott, 519 A.2d 968 (DC 2003). (BY: ETW)
09/02/2010TMC - OTSC
11/09/2010 On consideration of this court's September 2, 2010 SHOW CAUSE ORDER...and it appearing that the $100 filing fee has not been tendered, nor has a fully completed motion and financial information statement to proceed IFP been filed, it is ORDERED that the APPEAL IS DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13. (OBNBST) (rl)
11/09/2010DISMISSED
12/01/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived