judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES P. RUTTI, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-168)
Case Number:06-168Case Docketed On:07/18/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:JAMES P. RUTTI, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMES P. RUTTI, JR., Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJames P. Rutti Jr. Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/18/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/18/2006Petition - Writ - certiorariPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
07/18/2006Motion - Appointment of counselMotionAppointment of counselFinal
07/18/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
07/28/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/08/2006Order - Other - denying petition for writ of certiorari and motion for appointment of counsel, granting motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisOrderOtherFinal
08/08/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - petitioner's reply to motion to dismiss, returned, unfiledNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/16/2006Motion - Reconsideration on denial of petition for writ certiorari, returned unfiledMotionReconsiderationFinal