judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNIE D. FOSTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0961
Short Caption:JOHNNIE D. FOSTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3304-84Filed Date:08/11/1987

Opening Event Date:08/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnnie D. Foster N
James G. Mcguire YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOSTER, JOHNNIE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RUBY NIGHTINGALE NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 FE: THEFT NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 8/2/89 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 03 FILE BRF ON OR BEF 8/9/89. ANY NOTE - 04 FURTHER REQUEST FOR AN EXT. OF NOTE - 04 TIME WILL BE LOOKED UPON WITH NOTE - 05 DISFAVOR. NOTE - 05
08/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES G. McGUIRE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/06/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD R
11/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 110687 SCHPRD BA
12/16/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD EBP
01/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (85 PGS - SHELTON) PB PANEL SCDATE 111787 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1989ORDER SS, SR#1 & 2 IN 86-1197 FILED AS SR IN THIS APPEAL; APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 111587 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (RT 105 PGS RAMOS) PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 86-1197. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (RT 746 PGS KACZOROWSKI) PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 86-1197 EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
04/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 19, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & BA FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-10-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD OPA
07/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 9TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BE
08/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 5 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD CHECK
08/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BE
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (10 PGS - RAMOS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD