judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. ELIZABETH MCALISTER

Case Information: 89-CM-0246
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. ELIZABETH MCALISTERClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11619-88Filed Date:03/08/1989

Opening Event Date:03/08/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeElizabeth Mcalister N
Phyllis Joan Baron NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES MCALISTER, ELIZABETH
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/24/89 ORDER GRT MOTION OF NOTE - 01 APLT TO CON THIS APPEAL W/ NOTE - 02 89-209 & 89-220 FO THAT BRF NOTE - 02 OF APLT SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS NOTE - 03 AFTER THE RECORD IS FILED IN NOTE - 03 THIS APPEAL & 89-209. NOTE - 04 CON 89-209 & 89-220 NOTE - 04
03/08/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/17/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHYLLIS BARON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 89-209 & 89-220 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-3 PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD CHECK
09/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (13 PGS - RAMOS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (359 PGS - SALAZAR; 30 PGS - TREMEL)(SEE RECORD IN 89-209 & 89-253 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD X
09/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
10/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD