judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD A. EDELIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0964
Short Caption:HAROLD A. EDELIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1129-87Filed Date:08/07/1987

Opening Event Date:08/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold A. Edelin N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EDELIN, HAROLD A. UNITED STATES
08/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092587 SCHPRD DSA
10/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(226 PGS/VANBREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD RT
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-28-88 (NO OPPO) AD PB PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/30/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 122888 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/30/89 ANY FURTHER REQ WILL BE BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD CHECK
02/03/1989ORDER DIRG BA BE FILED BY 2/13/89 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BA
03/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/19/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 032189 SCHPRD V
04/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 19TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD BE
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD OPA
05/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 2ND JB PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 053189 SCHPRD OPA
06/21/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 7-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF TO 7/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD MXRBA
07/24/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 8/7/89 (APPELLANT'S) GT PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD RBA
08/14/1989ORDER REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD X
08/14/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD RBA
12/05/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD