judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD L. PROCTOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0966
Short Caption:RICHARD L. PROCTOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2491-87Filed Date:08/06/1987

Opening Event Date:08/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/16/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/26/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard ProctorN
Irwin A. Goldberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Jock A. Banks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PROCTOR, RICHARD L. UNITED STATES
08/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) IRWIN GOLDBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092587 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD R
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (120 PGS - JANIFER) GT PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD RT
06/15/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TEN (10) DAYS AFTER MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IS GRANTED GT PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO LV TO FL LDG BRF, AND EXT TM TO FL APLE BRF TO 10/17/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
10/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/16/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/26/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELTESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD