judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSIAH H. HAYNESWORTH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0458
Short Caption:JOSIAH H. HAYNESWORTH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10325-88Filed Date:04/10/1989

Opening Event Date:04/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJosiah H. Haynesworth N
Alfred J. Merlie NN
AppellantJosiah H. Haynesworth N
Cary Clennon NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAYNESWORTH, JOSIAH H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/12/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF ALFRED MERLIE & APPT CARY NOTE - 02 CLENNON FOR APLT;NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO FL STSTE IN 20 AS NOTE - 03 TO STATUS OF PENDG RT.
01/01/1906 MERLIEA VACATED 9/12/89
04/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD DSA
07/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD R
09/05/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ALFRED J. MERLIE AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CARY CLENNON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD GG
10/10/1989STATEMENT RE PENDING TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD STATE
10/27/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (9 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(125 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 021790 SCHPRD RT
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (257 PGS. -- HOLLAND) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040790 SCHPRD RT
01/31/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/13/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO DISMISS APPEAL & THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. PANELJWR SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD B
02/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
03/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD