judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES C. LANE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0532
Short Caption:JAMES C. LANE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CM-0078 Consolidated:89-CM-0532
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9581-87Filed Date:08/01/1988

Opening Event Date:08/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LANE, JAMES C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/23/89 ORD: THE NOTICE OF NOTE - 01 APPEAL FM THE TRIAL CT'S NOTE - 02 DENIAL OF APLT'S MO TO VACATE NOTE - 02 CONVICTION AND SENTENCE IS NOTE - 03 FILED NUNC PRO TUNC TO 8/1/88, NOTE - 03 AND SHALL BE KNOWN HEREINAFTER NOTE - 04 AS APPEAL NO. 89-532 AND THAT NOTE - 04 NOS. 88-78 AND 89-532 SHALL BE NOTE - 05 CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTE - 05 FO THAT THESE CASES ARE NOTE - 06 REMANDED FOR A HRG ON WHETHER NOTE - 06 A SEIZURE W/I THE CONTEXT OF NOTE - 07 THE FOURTH AMENDMENT OCCURRED. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 CON: 88-78 NOTE - 08
08/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1989MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED TO JJ MK/FE/PY PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989REMANDED SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 7 SL PANELMKFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD