Case: 01-08-00117-CV
01-08-00117-CV
02/20/2008
Contract
Jose Raul Jimenez
Teresa Dunham
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
10/17/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/29/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||
08/26/2009 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
08/10/2009 | Record checked in | | |||||
08/08/2009 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
08/07/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/07/2009 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
08/06/2009 | Record checked out | | |||||
08/04/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
08/04/2009 | Motion to substitute attorney disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/24/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Motion to substitute attorney filed | | |||||
07/24/2009 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
07/09/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
07/09/2009 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
06/02/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
05/12/2009 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
12/16/2008 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/25/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/20/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
11/10/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
11/06/2008 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/22/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/17/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
09/24/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
09/22/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/19/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
09/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
09/01/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
08/28/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/28/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
08/11/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
07/29/2008 | Response due | | |||||
07/16/2008 | Response due | | |||||
07/09/2008 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record | | |||||
06/26/2008 | No reporters record filed in civil case | | |||||
05/21/2008 | Response due | | |||||
05/14/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
05/01/2008 | Notice of late docketing statement | | |||||
04/24/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||
04/24/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||
03/24/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
03/11/2008 | Court fee due | | |||||
03/06/2008 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
03/03/2008 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/27/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||
02/23/2008 | Record due | | |||||
02/20/2008 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
02/20/2008 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
02/13/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/14/2008 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/29/2016 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
09/28/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dunham, Teresa | Appellee | William B. Portis Jr. |
Jimenez, Jose Raul | Appellant | Ike N A Waobikeze Michael Singh Panesar |
Trial Court Information
113th District Court
Harris
Honorable Hon. Patricia Hancock
0442113