judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VILEAN STEVENS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0486
Short Caption:VILEAN STEVENS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M12518-88Filed Date:04/27/1989

Opening Event Date:04/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVilean Stevens N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Andrew S. LevetownYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEVENS, VILEAN UNITED STATES
04/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DOWD, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD DSA
08/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (71 PGS/LEWIS) RTC RJG RJG PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD R
09/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (133 PGS. -- TANNER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD RT
10/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(23 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 121389 SCHPRD RT
12/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (9-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (RECORD COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 121689 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-10-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-10-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD GR
08/07/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 081090 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/06/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091290 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL AD PANELRGTESC SCDATE 021491 SCHPRD CSUM
02/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -TE CITE
03/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD