judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDILBERTO A. JOSEPH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0464
Short Caption:EDILBERTO A. JOSEPH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1367-89Filed Date:03/22/1989

Opening Event Date:03/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOSEPH, EDILBERTO A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURIS; NOTE - 01 SEE KWAYKE V DC, 464 A.2D 643
03/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/16/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE (SEE NOTE FIELD 1) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/07/1989ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD R
06/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
06/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD