judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN A. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0322
Short Caption:STEPHEN A. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8612-88Filed Date:03/28/1989

Opening Event Date:03/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/11/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen A. Smith N
Ted Kavrukov YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, STEPHEN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/03/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KAVRUKOVT FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
03/28/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/07/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TED KAVRUKOV, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD DSA
06/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD R
07/31/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(171 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 18, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BA
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/18/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD X
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-10-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/10/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD X
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED COPY OF BRIEF AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989RECEIVED APLE'S CORRECTED COPY OF BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF **CORRECTED COPY** GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO FILE CORRECTED COPY OF BRIEF. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/05/1990ARGUED PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL. PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 583 A.2d 975
11/14/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 3472 D-1
12/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD