judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERNEST ANDREW ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0332
Short Caption:ERNEST ANDREW ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9649-88Filed Date:03/27/1989

Opening Event Date:03/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/30/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErnest Andrew Robinson N
Prudence Bushnell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth A. BreseeYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, ERNEST ANDREW UNITED STATES
03/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/07/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PRUDENCE BUSHNELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 050989 SCHPRD DSA
06/30/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 052689 SCHPRD R
09/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (37 PGS RT - SHELTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (71 PGS RT - BURNEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD X
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS -NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INC. 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BA
01/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-1-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 013090 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/1/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD M
03/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD