judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRY LEE STRONG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0503
Short Caption:HARRY LEE STRONG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11860-88Filed Date:05/06/1989

Opening Event Date:05/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/07/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarry Lee Strong N
Joseph J. Gigliotti YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Eric M. Acker YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STRONG, HARRY LEE UNITED STATES
05/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/18/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH J. GIGLIOTTI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD DSA
08/07/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD R
10/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (133 PGS RT - GOAD) GT PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD RT
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD BA
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122589 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD U
01/23/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (54 PGS. -- WILLIAMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD RT
03/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022290 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD V
06/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/28/1990SUBMITTED PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1990REVERSED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION. PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RV METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 581 A.2d 383
10/18/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 3275
11/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD