judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCENT D. IMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0495
Short Caption:VINCENT D. IMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:89-CM-0495Consolidated: 89-CF-0637 , 89-CF-0638 , 89-CF-0736 , 89-CF-0737
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13725-88Filed Date:04/17/1989

Opening Event Date:04/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVincent D. Imes N
James J. Fishel YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IMES, VINCENT D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/10/90 ORD: CONSOLIDATING NOTE - 01 89-495 W/89-637,-638,-736, & NOTE - 02 -737; FILING LODGED BRIEFS OF NOTE - 02 APLE; CLK TO SCHEDULE CASES ON NOTE - 03 CALENDAR AS SN AS BIZ OF THE NOTE - 03 COURT PERMITS. NOTE - 04 CON 89-637,-638,-736,-737 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/23/90 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO NOTE - 05 PROPOSING DATES FOR SCHDG ORAL NOTE - 06 ARGUMENT AS MOOT AND CNSL FOR NOTE - 06 APLT IS DIRTD TO ADVISE THIS NOTE - 07 COURT W/I 20 DAYS IF HE WILL NOTE - 07 BE AVAILABLE TO ARGUE CASE OR NOTE - 08 WHETHER HIS APPTMT SHOULD BE NOTE - 08 VACATED.
04/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES J. FISHEL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD DSA
10/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (8 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD R
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD BA
12/05/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT PROPOSING DATES FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-18-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(24 PGS/BOSTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(11; 23 PGS/ARTIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL W/ 89-638 & 89-637 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF IN 89-495. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF IN NOS. 89-637,89-638, 89-736 AND 89-737. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 8 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER RE: AVAILA- BILITY FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 061290 SCHPRD ANSA
06/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/29/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN MOTION. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD