judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AVA BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0480
Short Caption:AVA BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1149-88Filed Date:04/18/1989

Opening Event Date:04/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/24/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAva Brown N
James B. MilesYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Brenda J. Johnson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, AVA UNITED STATES
04/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES B. MILES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DSA OR CASE MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD DSA
07/24/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/24/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (18 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD R
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(146 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
11/08/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-13-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111189 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INC. 12/13/89. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 11, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121389 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/11/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD M
01/11/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-12-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD BE
01/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD V
05/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/03/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED CASE WAS REVERSED AND REMANDED TO LOWER COURT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PANELRGNEPR SCDATE 050390 SCHPRD RDEC
07/10/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -NW CITE 584 A.2d 537
07/10/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 1740
07/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD