judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUAN C. ROACH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0483
Short Caption:JUAN C. ROACH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6171-88Filed Date:04/04/1989

Opening Event Date:04/04/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/17/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJuan C. Roach N
Carmen A. Jacobs YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
James F. Rutherford YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROACH, JUAN C. UNITED STATES
04/04/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/17/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1989ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FL DSA, DR/SRT & $50 FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 041489 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD R
10/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(53 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD RT
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR THIRTY DAYS (30) AJ PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD V
01/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR A PERIOD OF 30 DAYS. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD BA
05/03/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-31-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 050390 SCHPRD BE
05/23/1990ORDER GRNT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BR TO 05-31-90. NFX GR PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD Q
05/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD BE
09/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (19 PGS - SWARINGER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD