judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID C. SPENCER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0514
Short Caption:DAVID C. SPENCER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8756-87Filed Date:05/03/1989

Opening Event Date:05/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid C. Spencer N
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mark J. Carroll YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SPENCER, DAVID C. UNITED STATES
05/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 060289 SCHPRD DSA
08/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD R
09/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (131 PGS - PIRFO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (216 PGS RT - HUNT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
11/29/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD CHECK
01/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 7, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD BE
02/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 21, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLE MO & LODGED BRIEF IS FILED. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD V
06/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/28/1990SUBMITTED PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT 90-5652 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied