judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEANETTA M. HILL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0379
Short Caption:JEANETTA M. HILL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M14400-88Filed Date:04/14/1989

Opening Event Date:04/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/30/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/24/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeanetta M. Hill N
Paul Edward Kay YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Guizelous O. Molock YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HILL, JEANETTA M. A/K/A JEANSTTA HICKS UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/24 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KAYP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MOLOCKG FOR - APPELLEE
04/14/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/25/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (102 PGS SCHOCH - 8 PGS MOLLICHELLI) JB PANEL SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD R
08/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL EDWARD KAY, EQ. PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-3-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD BA
09/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/3/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD X
11/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110389 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD BE
01/08/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/9/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
01/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-23-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 010990 SCHPRD BE
01/23/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/30/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD V
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT (SEE MOTION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO RESCHED ARG THOUGH COUNSL MAY APPEAR FOR ARG AT 11 RATHER THAN 9:30.DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD VS
04/05/1990MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APLT RE: RESCHUDLEING ORAL ARGUMENT (SEE MOTION) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT RECONSID RE- SCHED ORD & REMOVE CASE FROM REG CAL OF 4/11;RESCHED ASAP. PANEL SCDATE 041190 SCHPRD CREG
04/17/1990ORDER RESCHED CASE FOR ARG ON REG CAL OF 5/24/90 AT 1:30 P.M. DAS PANELFEBETE SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD CHECK
05/24/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/1990ARGUED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/18/1990AFFIRMED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD