judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38106
Short Caption:BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38460
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173967Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-11068
07/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/26/01, 05/21/01, 06/19/01. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun and Tom Mercer. No district court file stamp. 01-11302
07/11/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/26/01. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 01-11721
07/17/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/26/01, 05/21/01, 06/19/01. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun and Tom Mercer. Filed in district court on: July 3, 2001. 01-12122
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 21, 2001. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 01-13243
08/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-13364
08/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On August 8, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14407
08/24/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.