judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREDERICK HERR, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Adrian Herr, deceased v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Heading (S-07-0116)
Case Number:S-07-0116Case Docketed On:05/30/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:FREDERICK HERR, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Adrian Herr, deceased v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Full Title:FREDERICK HERR, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Adrian Herr, deceased, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrederick HerrDion James Custis
AppelleeFord Motor CompanyRichard Alan Mincer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/30/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/30/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/11/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/22/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
08/23/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/23/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal