judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: BENOIT OTIS BROOKENS, CPUL NO. 33-08

Case Information: 10-BG-0898
Short Caption:IN RE: BENOIT OTIS BROOKENS, CPUL NO. 33-08Classification:Bar Governance - Bar - Unauthorized Practice Of Law
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/22/2010

Opening Event Date:07/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDcca Committee on Unauthorized Practice of LawN
Theodore P. Metzler NN
RespondentBenoit Otis Brookens, IINPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/22/2010PETITION TO ADJUDICATE CONTEMPT pursuant to D.C. Court of Appeals Rule 49(e) to initiate criminal contempt procedings against Respondent; assign a judge to preside over the proceedings, issue an order for Respondent to show cause why he should not be held in contempt, and schedule a status hearing.
07/22/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF COMM. ON ADMISSIONS based on the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law submitted by the Committee on Unauthorized Practice of Law on October 2, 2008.
08/17/2010RECEIVED a copy of the certificate of service pertaining to the petition and the report and recommendation filed by the Committee on Unauthorized Practice of Law on July 22, 2010.
09/01/2010ORDER WHEREAS, the business of the District of Columbia Court of Appeals requires the designation and temporary assignment of a judge of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia to serve on this court. NOW THEREFORE, pursuant to D.C. Code Sec 11-707 (a), I hereby designate and assign the Honorable Jose M. Lopez, an Associate Judge of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, to serve as a judge of this Court to conduct a contempt hearing in case no. 10-BG-898, In re: Denoit Otis Brookens, II, and for such additional time in advance of said proceedings or thereafter as may be required to prepare for and dispose of said case. (ETW)
09/01/2010ORDER On consideration of the Committee on Unauthorized Practice of Law's Petition to Adjudicate Criminal Contempt, the findings of fact and conclusion of law, and the record, and it appearing that respondent was permanently enjoined by the Court on August 1, 1986, which injunction was upheld in Brookens v. Committee on Unauthorized Practice of Law, 538 A.2d 1120 (D.C. 1988), it is ORDERED that the Committee on Unauthorized Practice of Law's petition for an order to show cause why respondent should not be held in criminal contempt is granted, and the Clerk is directed to transmit the pleadings herein to the Honorable Jose M. Lopez, Judge of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, designated in accordance with D.C. Code Sec 11-707 (a) to serve as a judge of this Court, for a hearing to be conducted with respect to the issue whether respondent should be found in criminal contempt. (KR,BR,NE)
09/07/2010ORDER Before the Court is an order, rendered by the District of Columbia Court of Appeals designating the undersigned to conduct a criminal contempt proceeding. Therefore, Benoit Otis Brookens is hereby ordered to appear in the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, 500 Indiana Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20001, in Courtroom 114, on September 30, 2010, at 11:00 a.m, before Judge Jose M. Lopez, for a status hearing, Failure to appear shall result in a bench warrant for Mr. Brookens arrest. It is SO ORDERED on this 7th day of September 2010. (Judge Jose M. Lopez)
10/06/2010RECEIVED a copy of the Bench Warrant issued against respondent on September 30, 2010, by Judge Jose Lopez, for failing to appear, and bond set at $10,000
03/21/2011RECEIVED Government's notice of filing.
08/23/2011FiledOpposition of Government to defendant's motion to replace Cynthia Wright as prosecutor and motion to modify terms of pretrial release. (Petitioner)
09/02/2011FiledOpposition of Government to respondent's motion to dismiss. (Petitioner)
09/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File nunc pro tunc and opposition to motion for immediate order of dismissal Opposition/Reply/Answer (Petitioner)
09/02/2011LodgedReceived opposition to defendant's mandatory motion. (Petitioner)
01/09/2013FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Order of Contempt that the defendendant has been found guilty of four counts of contempt (Count 15, 16, 18, and 19) and having been found guilty by the court, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant has been convicted of and is guilty of the offenses charges and is hereby sentenced as to Counts 15, 16, 18, & 19 - 180 days in jail, ESS as to all Counts are to run consecutive to each othe, 2 years supervised probation with conditions. (Judge Jose Lopez)
01/09/2013FiledDismissed