judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PERCY JETER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0939
Short Caption:PERCY JETER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 87-CF-0584 Consolidated:87-CF-0939, 89-CF-0584
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3804-80Filed Date:07/22/1987

Opening Event Date:07/22/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/20/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPercy Jeter N
J. Herbie Difonzo NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JETER, PERCY UNITED STATES
01/01/1902APLT'S MO FOR TRANSCRIPTS AT THE EXPENSE OF D.C.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM HAWTHORNE NOTE - 01 #87-998 NOTE - 02 5/10/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 02 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 03 OF RUSSELL F. CANAN & APPT NOTE - 03 ANITA ISICSON FOR APLT;NEWLY- NOTE - 04 APPTD COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN NOTE - 04 20 DAYS INDICATING COMPLETION NOTE - 05 DATE OF RT ORDERED. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 07 10/6/88 ORD GRT APLT MO FO EXT NOTE - 07 OF TM TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 08 & SCH BE 30 DAYS THERAFTER & NOTE - 08 GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, NOTE - 09 CLK TO FL LDG BRF IN 87-998. NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 031089 ORDER: GRANT APLE MOS & NOTE - 10 CLK TO FILE LDGD APLE BR; FO: NOTE - 11 GRANT ANITA ISCSON, ESQ., MO NOTE - 11 TO W/DRAW AS COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 12 IN 87-939; FO: APPOINTING NOTE - 12 CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. AS COUN NOTE - 13 FOR APLT IN 87-939; FO: CLK TO NOTE - 13 SCHED ON CAL ASAP. NOTE - 14 4/19/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 14 NO 87-939 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS NOTE - 15 IN NO 87-939 ARE HEREBY STAYED NOTE - 15 PDG DISP OF 23-110 MO FILED IN NOTE - 16 TRIAL CT. FO THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 16 APLT IN NO 87-939 SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 17 THIS CT W/I 30 DAYS RE STATUS NOTE - 17 OF THE 23-110 MOTION. FO THAT NOTE - 18 APPEAL NOS. 87-939 & 87-998 NOTE - 18 ARE HEREBY SEVERED W/O PREJ. NOTE - 19 TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED AFTER NOTE - 19 DISP. OF THE 23-110 MOTION NOTE - 20 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 20 NOTE - 21 CON: 89-584 NOTE - 21 NOTE - 22 FILED. FO THAT THESE APPEALS NOTE - 22 BE SCHEDULED FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 23 BEFORE A MERITS DIV. AS SOON NOTE - 23 AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 24 10/31/90 ORD: GRT MO TO W/D AS NOTE - 24 COUNSEL AND THE APPTMT OF NOTE - 25 CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ., AS NOTE - 25 COUNSEL FOR APLT IS VACATED. NOTE - 26 FO THAT J. HERBIE DIFONZO, ESQ NOTE - 26 IS HEREBY APPTD TO REPRESENT NOTE - 27 APLT ON THIS APPEAL AND THAT NOTE - 27 NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL SHALL FILE NOTE - 28 THE PET FOR REH/REH EB W/I 14 NOTE - 28 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STEINMETZC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 CANANR VACATED 5/10/88. ISICSONA VACATED 3/10/89 STEINMETZC VACATED 10/31/90 DIFONZOJ PER 10/31/90 ORDER
07/22/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RUSSELL F. CANAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
11/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (579 PGS - RHOADES) PB PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD RT
11/30/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DSA
12/03/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 11/30/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987ORDER CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD DSA
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (9 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (35 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(VOL.I & II 1175 PGS TR PIRFO) GREG PANEL SCDATE 111587 SCHPRD RT
04/11/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE LETTER RE: COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD GG
05/27/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD STATE
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (225 PGS - TREMEL) MLH PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1988RECORD COMPLETED
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER SS, CONS 87-939 & 87-998; BRF OF APLTS DUE BY 8/8/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-998 TO 9/6/88 (NO OPE) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 8, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CALVIN STEINMETZ FOR ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & FOR ORAL ARG. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 23, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-998 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-998 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/7/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 9/19/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-998 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD: 7-9 PB PANELPY SCDATE 092788 SCHPRD OPE
10/07/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BA
10/21/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF ENTER APPRNC OF CALVIN STEINMETZ AS CO-COUNSEL FOR APLT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD Q
11/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/14/88 PB GT PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BE
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/13/89; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD OPA
01/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-13-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
01/19/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRF RJG PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD OPA
01/24/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ANITA ISICSON AS CO-COUNSEL AND CALVIN STEINMETZ WILL CONTINUE AS COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 50 PAGES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD GG
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 - 13. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD CHECK
03/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL UNTIL TRIAL COURT RULES ON MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14 THRU 20 SL PANELRO SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD N
05/16/1989RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER DATED 5/15/89, FROM TRIAL JUDGE WEISBERG, RE- GARDING 23-110 MOTION MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD STATE
05/25/1989ORDER SCHED CASE FOR CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS THE CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052389 SCHPRD X
06/01/1989RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER DATED 5/26/89 FROM TRIAL JUDGE WEISBERG RE MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER DENY PRO SE MO OF APLT FOR APPMT OF COUNSEL AS MOOT, COUNSEL HAVING BEEN APPTD.DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989RECEIVED APLT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT IN 89-584 TO ADD ON FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR RELIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-939 & 89- 584 FOR ALL PURP; PRO SE MOT FOR RELIEF IS DENIED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLENT RE: PREVIOUS REQUESTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTING COPIES OF PREVIOUS MOTIONS FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF IN NO. 89-584 JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR X TM TO FL BRF IN NO. 89-584 & LODGED BRF IS SEE NOTE FIELDS 22 THRU 23 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD CHECK
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 89-584 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/23/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT-MOTION OF AMEND APPEAL. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990LETTER REFERRING TO COUNSEL FOR APLT APLT'S 4/20/90 MOTION., DAS PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990RECEIVED LETTER (PRO SE) REGARDING COUNSEL JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1990LETTER REFERRING LTR FROM APLT TO HIS COUNSEL SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT'S MOT TO WITH DRAW IS DENIED. MEH PANELNWFEST SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD VS
09/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/17/1990ARGUED PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990LETTER RE ATTR TO WITHDRAW AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990MEMORANDUM REFERRING APLT PRO SE LETTER OF 9/19 TO COUSEL OF RECORD. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1990MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO (?) AND CALVIN STEINMETZ TO WITHDRAW FROM APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. HERBIE DiFONZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 24 THRU 28 SL PANELRO SCDATE 103090 SCHPRD OPE
11/16/1990MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLANT, PERCY JETER, FOR 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB WITHIN 30 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELRO SCDATE 111490 SCHPRD MRRB
12/19/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 122190 SCHPRD MRRB
03/20/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIPMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied
01/28/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION MO. OF APLT FOR TRANSCRIPTS AT THE EXPENSE OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1992ORDER deny appellant's motion for transcripts at the expense of the District of Columbia (FESTNW)
06/03/1992deny appellant's pro se motion to recall mandate
07/01/1992APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AND SUGGESTIONSFOR REHEARING EN BANC
07/29/1992ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC and deny appellant's petition to appoint counsel (Judges Terry and Farrell have recused themselves from this case) (EB)