judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY W. DANIELS JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0523
Short Caption:JEFFREY W. DANIELS JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2876-89Filed Date:05/12/1989

Opening Event Date:05/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DANIELS JR., JEFFREY W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 052589 ORDER: DISMISSED AS NOTE - 01 HAVING BEEN NOTED FROM A NON- NOTE - 02 FINAL ORDER. SEE KWAYKE V. DC NOTE - 02 494 A.2D 643 (DC 1985)
05/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/25/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/20/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO RESPOND TO 5/25/89 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO AMEND THE FILE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD