judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELIZABETH S. LOZARO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0227
Short Caption:ELIZABETH S. LOZARO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9980-88Filed Date:03/03/1989

Opening Event Date:03/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElizabeth Lozaro N
Ferris R. BondYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Richard L. Chamovitz YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOZARO, ELIZABETH S. UNITED STATES
03/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FERRIS R. BOND, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (218 PGS - HUNT) (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD R
08/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (19 PGS - SWARINGER) JB PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD RT
08/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (341 PGS RT - SCHERTZER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092689 SCHPRD BA
11/16/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD U
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR ONLY TO EXTENT APLT'S BRIEF TO BE FLD W/IN 30 DAYS. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/18/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD K
04/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART MOJ VA REC'VING STOLEN PROP CONVCTN & CASE RM FOR RESENTCG ...REMAINING JDGMT AF. PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - VAAF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD