judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHELLE RAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0226
Short Caption:MICHELLE RAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6990-88Filed Date:02/28/1989

Opening Event Date:02/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/25/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/11/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichelle Ray N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAY, MICHELLE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 120189 ORD: APLT MO TO CALEN- NOTE - 01 DAR CASE W/O APLE BRF DENIED; NOTE - 02 APLE BRF DUE IN 10 DAYS OR NOTE - 02 CASE WILL BE CALENDARED ON NOTE - 03 RECORD & APLT BRF ONLY. NOTE - 03
02/28/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/15/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM RPTR RHOADES OF 12/6 THRU 12/9/88 PROC. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT M. HAUSMAN, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1989MEMORANDUM ATTORNEY NEVER REC'D APPOINT- MENT VOUCHER. RE-SENT THIS DATE GG PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
04/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD DSA
06/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (260 PGS/RHOADES) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD R
07/25/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD CHECK
08/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PURSUANT TO RULE 30 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-23-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/23/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD CHECK
11/08/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR MO TO CALENDAR THE CASE AND COURT TO ORDER APLE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD M
12/11/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD BE
01/02/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 575 A.2d 1196
05/31/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 1465
06/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD