judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

E.A. BAKER COMPANY INC. V. HERBERT H. HAFT

Case Information: 89-CM-0535
Short Caption:E.A. BAKER COMPANY INC. V. HERBERT H. HAFTClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M50-89Filed Date:05/22/1989

Opening Event Date:05/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/07/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantE.A. Baker Company Inc.N
AppellantJohn Doe N
Francis J. Pelland YN
AppelleeHerbert H. Haft N
Rodney F. Page YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Leonard S. Goodman NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901E.A. BAKER COMPANY INC. HAFT, HERBERT H.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/18/90 ORD: GRT APLT'S REQ. NOTE - 01 FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND TO NOTE - 02 POSTPONE ARGUMENT AND THIS NOTE - 02 APPEAL IS HEREBY REMOVED FROM NOTE - 03 ARGUMENT ON THE SUMMARY NOTE - 03 CALENDAR OF JAN. 24, 1990. FO NOTE - 04 THAT THIS APPEAL IS RESCHD. NOTE - 04 FOR ARGUMENT ON TUESDAY, NOTE - 05 FEBRUARY 6, 1990, AT 1:30 P.M. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/02/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PELLANDF FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GOODMANLE FOR - APPELLEE
05/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/24/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT 6/2/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD APPELLANT'S PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER TO APLT'S COUNSEL RE: RECORD PICK-UP RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD R
06/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (53 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S RESPONSE TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/29/89 (NO OPA) (SHORT PAPER) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/29/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX AD PANEL SCDATE 072589 SCHPRD BA
08/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/29/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD M
09/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/29/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/29/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092989 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APPELLANT) TO 11/10/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF TO 11/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD M
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111089 SCHPRD RBA
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT TO NEXT AVAILABLE SESSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 5 SL PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/06/1990ARGUED PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 578 A.2d 706
08/16/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 2454
09/07/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD