judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAREN S. GLENN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0545
Short Caption:KAREN S. GLENN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2643-89Filed Date:05/11/1989

Opening Event Date:05/11/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GLENN, KAREN S. UNITED STATES
05/11/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/07/1989ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/05/1989ORDER DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO COM- PLY WITH 6/7/89 ORDER. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD ANSA
07/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD