judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. MAX J. OBUSZEWSKI

Case Information: 89-CM-0209
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. MAX J. OBUSZEWSKIClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11618-88Filed Date:02/22/1989

Opening Event Date:02/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeMax J. Obuszewski N
Phyllis Joan Baron NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES OBUSZEWSKI, MAX J.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-220 & 89-246 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 7/24/89 ORDER GRT MOTION TO NOTE - 02 CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL W/ NOTE - 03 89-220 & 89-246 AND BRF OF NOTE - 03 APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD NOTE - 04 IS FILED IN THIS APPEAL & NO. NOTE - 04 89-246.
02/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/03/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHYLLIS BARON, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 89-220 & 89-246 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 2-4 PB PANELRO SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD N
08/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD R
09/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (359 PGS - SALAZAR; 30 PGS - TREMEL) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD X
09/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
10/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD