judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY L. EASTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0206
Short Caption:STANLEY L. EASTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4288-88Filed Date:02/15/1989

Opening Event Date:02/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/23/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley L. Easton N
Samuel Ed Wilhite YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Richard L. Chamovitz YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EASTON, STANLEY L. UNITED STATES
02/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ED WILHITE, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FL DSA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 042189 SCHPRD DSA
07/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD R
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (184 PGS. -- MORRIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD RT
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 9, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 9, 1990 (AMENDED) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT SHALL FL BRF W/I 10 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD B
07/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 070590 SCHPRD BA
08/06/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-5-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD BE
08/14/1990RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 082390 SCHPRD V
12/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1990SUMMARY I CALENDAR GRANT APLT'S LTR REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL AGRUMENT. CT PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT APLT'S AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO SUBMIT W/O ORAL ARGUMENT. MEH PANELROFEKN SCDATE 122291 SCHPRD VS
01/23/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/23/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JMT ON APPEAL PANELROFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD