judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN H. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0452
Short Caption:JOHN H. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13045-88Filed Date:04/04/1989

Opening Event Date:04/04/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/25/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn H. Davis N
David A. CarrYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Robert J. SpagnolettiYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, JOHN H. aka: ANDERSON UNITED STATES
04/04/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID A. CARR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD DSA
09/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD R
09/21/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM HART - 2/6/89 PROCEEDING (NOT WITH JUDGE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR SALAZAR CERTIFICATION OF 2/6/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT CALLED THIS DATE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(279 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD
10/01/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
11/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-10-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1991RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 011591 SCHPRD B
01/29/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF, LODGED BRFS OF APLT & APLE FL, SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 112890 SCHPRD B
04/25/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/25/1991SUBMITTED PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD