judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MERIEL A. WOODS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0397
Short Caption:MERIEL A. WOODS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2445-89Filed Date:04/13/1989

Opening Event Date:04/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WOODS, MERIEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 050489 ORD: NOT BE DISMISSED NOTE - 01 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; SEE NOTE - 02 KWAYKE V. DC, 494 A.2D 643 NOTE - 02 (D.C. 1985)
04/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/04/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/25/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO RESPOND TO 5/4/89 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
06/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD