judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARMANE L. BELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0453
Short Caption:CHARMANE L. BELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10607-88Filed Date:05/01/1989

Opening Event Date:05/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/22/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharmane L. Bell N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Hiram E. Puig-Lugo YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John W. Kern YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELL, CHARMANE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/10/22 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PUIG-LUGOH FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KERNJ FOR - APPELLEE
05/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/19/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD R
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/30/1989ORDER GRANT MO FOR EXTENSION TO FILE TRANSCRIPT, REPORTER WRAY TO FILE RT BY 12/15/89 JB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (162-PGS/WRAY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD RT
01/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (281-PGS/HAWKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD RT
02/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 28, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD BA
03/06/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR UP TO AND INCLUDING 3/28/90. NFX. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD BA
03/29/1990RECEIVED OF APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD V
05/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-14-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1990ORDER APLE'S MO X TM TO FILE BRF GRNTD TO 06-14-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 060690 SCHPRD GR
06/14/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BE
08/31/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1990LETTER APLT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE IS GRANTED. CT PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO LATE FILE REQ TO FL REPLY BRIEF; FILE REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 100390 SCHPRD VS
10/09/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/22/1990ARGUED PANELSCWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELSCWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD