judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID W. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0946
Short Caption:DAVID W. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7459-84Filed Date:06/06/1987

Opening Event Date:06/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid W. Thomas N
Robert O. Goff YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, DAVID W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 041188 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT; CT RPTR TO FILE NOTE - 02 EST COMP DATE OF RT IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 03 01/05/90 ORD: APPEALS COORD. NOTE - 03 TO HAVE TRANSC TRANSMITTED AS NOTE - 04 SR, OR FILE STMT W/IN SAME NOTE - 04 TIME PERIOD, SETTING FORTH HIS NOTE - 05 INTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO NOTE - 05 PURSUING THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 06 01/22/90 ORD: W/IN 40 DAYS OR NOTE - 06 COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STMT W/IN NOTE - 07 20 DAYS INDICATING THAT ADDL NOTE - 07 TRANSCRIPT IS NEC FOR PREP. OF NOTE - 08 APPELLANT'S BRIEF. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 5/9/90 ORD: APPEAL SHOULD NOT NOTE - 09 BE CONSIDERED ON THE RECORD ON NOTE - 10 APPEAL & APLT'S BRIEF ALONE. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 06/28/90 ORD: GRANT MO TO EXT NOTE - 11 TM TO FL BE & BE FILED; F/O NOTE - 12 THAT CASE TO BE SCHD FOR CONSI NOTE - 12 BEFORE A MERITS DIV OF THIS NOTE - 13 CRT ASAP. NOTE - 13
06/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT O. GOFF, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/08/1987ORDER MO OF APLT STRESSING ENEFFECT- IVE COUNSEL REFERRED TO TRL CRT FOR FLNG & CONSIDERATION. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1987RECEIVED MMP-OF APLT STRESSING ENEFFECT IVE COUNSEL 23-110. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (16 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 111387 SCHPRD RT
01/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
01/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD M
05/24/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 5/20 & 5/21/87 RT BY 10/1/88-ABSOLUTELY -NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988ORDER REF MATTER OF RT TO TR CT FOR OTSC WHY CT RPTR (BRADLEY)SHLD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT CT.EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988RECEIVED COPY OF OTSC FROM TRIAL CRT HEARING DATE SET 12/9/88. (CT RPTR BRADLEY) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(172 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 1/24/89, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO COURT-APPOINTED ATTORNEY MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 1/24/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 7/6/89, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1989LETTER TO CNSL FOR APLT RE LTR RECVD FROM APLT SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) LETTER REQUESTING STATUS OF CASE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO MAKE ARRANGEMENTS W/ (SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 - 5) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/22/1990ORDER VACATING COURT'S ORDER OF 1/5/ 90 TO EXTENT BA SHALL BE FLD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 8) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JT PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
05/09/1990ORDER APPELLEE TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS, OR SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS (SEE NOTES 9 & 10) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 060890 SCHPRD BE
06/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THUR 13. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD V
06/29/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR SIMMS CERTIFICATION OF 5/20/87 PROC (ORDER CANCELLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/30/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELBESWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBESWKN SCDATE 103090 SCHPRD CSUM
10/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991RECEIVED LETTER FORM APLT WANTING STATUS OF APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1991LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR DATED 1/5/91 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD