Case: 05-06-00295-CV
05-06-00295-CV
03/07/2006
Summary Judgment
Tribble, Jeffrey and Streamwaves.com, Inc.
McCathern Mooty, L.L.P.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/18/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/18/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/10/2006 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
04/18/2006 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
04/18/2006 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
04/18/2006 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
04/17/2006 | Submission | | |
04/17/2006 | Submitted | | |
04/06/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
03/30/2006 | Notice to Party's that Clerk's Record Not Paid | | |
03/29/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
03/22/2006 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
03/22/2006 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
03/16/2006 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
03/16/2006 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
03/13/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
03/08/2006 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
03/08/2006 | Defective Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/08/2006 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
03/07/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/07/2006 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/28/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/02/2005 | Record due | | |
02/01/2005 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/18/2012 | Status | Destroy record |
07/18/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jeffrey Tribble And Streamwave | Appellant | Jeffrey Tribble |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Susan Mcwithey Reese
CC-04-05875-E