judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY M. TUCKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0931
Short Caption:STANLEY M. TUCKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F233-87Filed Date:08/11/1987

Opening Event Date:08/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley M. Tucker N
Clifford P. Ennist NN
AppellantStanley M. Tucker N
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TUCKER, STANLEY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/8/88 ORD: APPMT OF CLIFFORD NOTE - 01 P. ENNIST VACATED & DENNIS M. NOTE - 02 HART APPTD FOR APLT; BRF OF NOTE - 02 APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS;CLIFFORD P NOTE - 03 ENNIST TO DIR FORTHWITH TO NOTE - 03 TRANSMIT TO NEW COUNSEL ALL NOTE - 04 MATERIAL NECESSARY FOR COUNSEL NOTE - 04 USE.
01/01/1906 ENNISTC VACATED 12/8/88.
08/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLIFFORD P. ENNIST, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD R
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS - TREMEL) GT PANEL SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD RT
10/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(156 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 051588 SCHPRD RT
10/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. HART, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BA
01/31/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL TO FILE BA BY 2/10 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 13TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD BE
03/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/13/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022489 SCHPRD CHECK
04/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 27TH (NO OPA) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD BE
04/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BREIF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -RY CITE 571 A.2d 797
03/14/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RY PAGE # - 0666
04/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD