judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YOLANDA TATE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0203
Short Caption:YOLANDA TATE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M119-89Filed Date:02/24/1989

Opening Event Date:02/24/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/15/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/02/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYolanda Tate N
Hastings Jones NN
AppellantYolanda Tate N
Sheila B. AlbrightYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Elizabeth TrosmanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TATE, YOLANDA UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/11/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & VA- NOTE - 02 CATE APPMT OF HASTINGS JONES & NOTE - 02 APPT SHEILA ALBRIGHT FOR APLT; NOTE - 03 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO FL RECORD NOTE - 03 FORTHWITH.
01/01/1906 JONESH VACATED 4/11/89.
02/24/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HASTINGS JONES, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
04/26/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SHEILA ALBRIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 042589 SCHPRD R
05/15/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (39 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD R
06/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-10-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/10/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD V
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/13/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 091489 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1990ORDER GRANTG APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF; CLK TO FILE LODGED BRIEF. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD CHECK
05/02/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/02/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD