judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STACY D. HOWE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0201
Short Caption:STACY D. HOWE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M435-84Filed Date:03/01/1989

Opening Event Date:03/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/28/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/22/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStacy D. Howe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantStacy Howe N
Richard S. Greenlee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Kirby D. Behre YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOWE, STACY D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BEHREK FOR - APPELLEE
03/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/27/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 040689 SCHPRD DSA
04/07/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: NO TRANSCRIPT NEEDED FOR APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989ORDER GRANTING MOTION AND DIRG CLERK TO FILE LODGED DSA; FO APLT'S BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER REC. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD R
08/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 7TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BA
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/7/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD X
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 28TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 090789 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/28/89; NFX. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-2-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 18, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD BE
11/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/18/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD V
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1990 PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/22/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD M
03/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1990ORDER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/19/90. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD OPE
04/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990RECEIVED OF REPLY BRIEF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL REPLY BRF OF APLT. DAS PANELBESCPY SCDATE 041190 SCHPRD VS
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/1990ARGUED PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/11/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFORMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD