judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD FULLARD SR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0172
Short Caption:RICHARD FULLARD SR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9842-88Filed Date:02/09/1989

Opening Event Date:02/09/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Fullard, Sr.N
James J. Fishel YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FULLARD SR., RICHARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEF: GEORGE FULLARD NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 5/24/90 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO NOTE - 02 PROPOSING DATES FOR SCHDG ORAL NOTE - 03 ARGUMENT AS MOOT AND CNSL FOR NOTE - 03 APLT IS DIRTD TO ADVISE THIS NOTE - 04 COURT W/I 20 DAYS IF HE WILL NOTE - 04 BE AVAILABLE TO ARGUE THIS NOTE - 05 CASE OR WHETHER HIS APPTMT NOTE - 05 SHOULD BE VACATED. FO THAT NOTE - 06 THE MOTIONS OF APLT AND APLE NOTE - 06 TO FILE BRFS ARE GRTD AND THE NOTE - 07 CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE THE NOTE - 07 LODGED BRF OF APLT AND APLE NOTE - 08 AND THIS CASE SHALL BE SCHD NOTE - 08 FOR CONSIDERATION BEFORE A NOTE - 09 MERITS DIV. AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 09 CALENDAR PERMITS.
02/09/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES J. FISHEL, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (332 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD R
07/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (64 PGS. --WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD RT
07/25/1989LETTER DATED 7/24/89 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (11 PGS RT - JACKSON) GT PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD RT
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/17/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD M
11/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD BA
11/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD CHECK
12/05/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT PROPOSING DATES FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-22-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-22-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990RECEIVED COPY OF 1-30-90 SUP. CT ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 9 SL PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD Q
06/08/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER RE: AVAIL- ABILITY FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 061390 SCHPRD ANSA
10/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/17/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD