judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID B. SETTLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0968
Short Caption:DAVID B. SETTLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2834-87Filed Date:08/14/1987

Opening Event Date:08/14/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/25/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid B. Settles N
Marlon S. Charles YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
George J. Lane YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SETTLES, DAVID B. UNITED STATES
08/14/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARLON S. CHARLES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
11/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DSA
01/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (21 PGS - DAVIS) PB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
07/25/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (172 PGS - JANIFER) JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 19, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(185 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD M
11/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 12/14/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD V
12/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD BE
04/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD