judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELIZABETH MCALISTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0189
Short Caption:ELIZABETH MCALISTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead: 89-CM-0188 Consolidated:89-CM-0189, 89-CM-0253
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11619-88Filed Date:02/21/1989

Opening Event Date:02/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/22/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElizabeth Mcalister N
Phyllis Joan Baron YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Margaret A. Flaherty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCALISTER, ELIZABETH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/12/89 ORD: SS, CONS 89-188, NOTE - 01 89-189, & 89-253; CLK TO FL NOTE - 02 CNSOLIDATED BRF OF APLT; GRANT NOTE - 02 MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF NOTE - 03 TO/9/29/89. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 CON 89-188 & 89-253 NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/02/22 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BARONP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FLAHERTYM FOR - APPELLEE
02/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHYLLIS BARON, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
08/22/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM COURT REPORTER CALHOUN RE THE 1/3/89 PROCEEDING. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD R
09/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (13 PGS - RAMOS)(SEE RECORD IN 89-246 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (359 PGS - SALAZAR; 30 PGS - TREMEL)(SEE RECORD IN 89-209 & 89-253 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APLT) TO 12/19/89 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING RBA TO & INCLUDING 12/19/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD RBA
12/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1990LETTER GRT APLT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 011090 SCHPRD OPE
02/22/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/22/1990ARGUED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE
04/18/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1059
04/18/1991LETTER RE: APPOINTMENT OF NEW COUNSEL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD