judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0185
Short Caption:JOHN WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11200-88Filed Date:02/23/1989

Opening Event Date:02/23/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Williams N
George Anthony Fisher NN
AppellantJohn Williams N
Ralph Thomas Mabry YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, JOHN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/7/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF GEORGE FISHER & APPT RALPH NOTE - 02 THOMAS MABRY FOR APLT; APLT NOTE - 03 TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS; CLK OF NOTE - 03 SUPER CRT TO PREPARE & FL REC NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH. NOTE - 04
01/01/1906 FISHERGE VACATED 4/7/89.
02/23/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE A. FISHER, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF GEORGE A. FISHER AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
04/07/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RALPH THOMAS MABRY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040689 SCHPRD GG
04/20/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD DSA
06/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD R
08/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (63 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(55 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 111189 SCHPRD RT
01/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 15, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/15/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD V
02/20/1990RECEIVED OF APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FILE APLT'S BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD CHECK
04/10/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 26, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BE
04/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990ORDER GRTG APLE'S MOT & DIRG CLK TO FL LODGED BE; CASE TO BE SCH AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (VACATED 7/23/91) PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1991ORDER sua sponte VACATING MOJ ENTERED 7/12/91 PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE