judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALTER B. TODD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0960
Short Caption:WALTER B. TODD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11025-86Filed Date:08/07/1987

Opening Event Date:08/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/17/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/10/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWalter B. Todd N
Bill D. Burlison YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kathleen Brandon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TODD, WALTER B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BURLISONB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BRANDONK FOR - APPELLEE
08/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BILL D. BURLISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD R
03/17/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/17/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (205 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD RT
04/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 042688 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED CASE ASAP. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD V
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 1/10/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/10/1989ARGUED PANELNWTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWTEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD