judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID E. BURROUGHS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0934
Short Caption:DAVID E. BURROUGHS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:87-CF-0934Consolidated: 87-CF-0993
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11782-86Filed Date:08/07/1987

Opening Event Date:08/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/21/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid E. Burroughs N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BURROUGHS, DAVID E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES BROWN, KEVIN NOTE - 01 TAYLOR, RICHARD JOHNSON NOTE - 02 011188 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-854, NOTE - 02 87-934, 87-993 & 87-1068; FO: NOTE - 03 BRIEFS OF APLTS DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 03 AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 04 CON: 87-993 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 10/19/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 05 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-993 TO NOTE - 06 W/D & VACATE APPMT OF ROBERT NOTE - 06 H. HAAS & CLK TO ENTR APPRNC NOTE - 07 FO CARL V. ANGELIS AS RETAINED NOTE - 07 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-993; NOTE - 08 GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-1068 TO NOTE - 08 EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/18/88; NOTE - 09 BRF OF APLT IN 87-993 DUE IN NOTE - 09 40 DAYS. NOTE - 10 2/7/89 ORD GRT IN 87-854 APLT NOTE - 10 MO TO STAY APPEAL PENDING NOTE - 11 DISPOSITION ON MO TO VACATE NOTE - 11 SENT FILED IN THE SP CT AND NOTE - 12 SERVE COPY ON THIS CT FUR ORD NOTE - 12 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 13 SHALL ADVISE THIS CT REGARD- NOTE - 13 ING STATUS OF MO TO VACATE. NOTE - 14 FAILURE TO NOTIFY THIS CT W/IN NOTE - 14 5 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF NOT- NOTE - 15 ICEOF DISP OF MO PENDING IN SP NOTE - 15 CT WILL BE NON-COMPLIANCE W/ NOTE - 16 GENERAL RULES OF THIS COURT. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 3/1/89 ORD: CNSL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 17 NO. 87-1068 W/I 10 DAYS IS NOTE - 18 DIRTD TO COMPLY WITH THIS CT'S NOTE - 18 1/11/89 ORDER OR SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 19 WHY HIS APPTMT SHOULD NOT BE NOTE - 19 VACATED. NOTE - 20 4/19/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO. IN NOTE - 20 NO. 87-993 AND THE CLERK IS NOTE - 21 DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED BRF NOTE - 21 OF APLT. FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT NOTE - 22 IN NO. 87-1068 SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 22 THIS COURT W/I 30 DAYS RE NOTE - 23 STATUS OF THE 23-110 MOTION NOTE - 23 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. FO NOTE - 24 THAT APPEAL NO. 87-1068 IS NOTE - 24 HEREBY SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOS NOTE - 25 87-854, 87-934 AND 87-993 W/O NOTE - 25 PREJ. TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED NOTE - 26 AFTER DISP. OF THE 23-110 NOTE - 26 MOTION FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 27 4/21/89 ORD: APPEAL NO. 87-854 NOTE - 27 IS HEREBY SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOTE - 28 NOS. 87-934 & 87-993 W/O PREJ. NOTE - 28 TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED AFTER NOTE - 29 DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION NOTE - 29 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SECTION NOTE - 30 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 30 FO THAT THE BRF OF APLE IN NOS NOTE - 31 87-934 & 87-993 SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 31 W/I 30 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/08 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MORRISONW FOR - APLT BURROUGHS ATTY 2 - ANGELISC FOR - APLT JOHNSON ATTY 3 - VELTROPV FOR - APPELLEE
08/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/05/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD R
11/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (232 PGS - BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (576 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD RT
03/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (187 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 87-934 FOR EX TO FILE BR TO 10/5-NFX; APLTS BR IN CON CASES DUE 9/6/88.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (ROBERT H. HAAS) COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-854 PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-993 UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTERS FROM APLT IN 87-1068 RE: RELEASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988RECEIVED PRO SE AFFIDAVIT FROM APLT IN 87-1068 RE: CONTACT WITH ATTY RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988RECEIVED IN 87-933 APLT'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1988LETTER TRANSMITTING AFFIDAVIT TO THE SUP. CT. FOR CONSIDERATION SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(39 PGS/SWARINGER) IN 87-993 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO NOVEMBER 18TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-09. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
10/31/1988ORDER DENY APLT PRO SE MO FOR RELEAS PENDING APPEAL IN 87-1068. ACG PANELFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL IN 87-1068 PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL IN 87-854 PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/28/88 (NO OPE) IN #87-993 GT PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/89 (NO OPE) IN 87-993 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 21 IN NO. 87-1068 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S 23-110 MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION AND SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN 87-993 TO 1/27/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-993 TO FEBRUARY 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD CHECK
02/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 10-16 PB PANELRO SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD OPE
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/21/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RECORD MATERIAL RELIED UPON (LIST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/23/89 (NO OPE) FILED IN #87-993 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-993 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-993 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 THRU 19 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING MOTION PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE #23-110 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 87-993 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 20 THRU 26 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD CHECK
04/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 27 THRU 31 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 21ST (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/21/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD M
06/21/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/21/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062189 SCHPRD BE
07/10/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APLT IN 87-993 TO 7/17/89 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-993 MEH PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD CHECK
11/08/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1989ARGUED PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD