judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH MORRIS MALLORY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0933
Short Caption:JOSEPH MORRIS MALLORY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11338-86Filed Date:08/10/1987

Opening Event Date:08/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/29/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Morris Mallory N
Anita Isicson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ellen Bass YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MALLORY, JOSEPH MORRIS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/29/88 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 01 EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF AND CLK NOTE - 02 IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED APLE'S NOTE - 02 BRIEF. FO THAT CLK IS DIRTD TO NOTE - 03 CALENDAR THIS CASE FOR NOTE - 03 CONSIDERATION BEF A MERITS DIV NOTE - 04 AS SOON AS THE BUSINESS OF THE NOTE - 04 COURT PERMITS.
08/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 100987 SCHPRD R
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (261 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 24, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (74 PGS - MOLLICHELLI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 8, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 012488 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/29/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD N
07/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD