judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUSSELL J. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0504
Short Caption:RUSSELL J. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1087-89Filed Date:05/01/1989

Opening Event Date:05/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/24/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRussell J. Harris N
John M. CopacinoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, RUSSELL J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/10/90 ORD: APLE MO X TM TO NOTE - 01 FL LODGED BRF. FO THAT THIS NOTE - 02 APPEAL SHALL BE SCHEDULED FOR NOTE - 02 CONSIDERATION BEFORE A MERITS NOTE - 03 DIVISION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 03 CALENDAR PERMITS.
05/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989ORDER SS, JOHN M. COPACINO APPTD FOR APLT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/24/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (12 PGS/WILES) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD R
11/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (117 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD RT
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1990 NO OPE AJ PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/29/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/28/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 29, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BE
03/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 12, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MOTIONS FOR X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/12/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD B
04/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 20, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 041290 SCHPRD BE
04/20/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD B
10/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/11/1990SUBMITTED PANELTEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD