judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THADDEUS L. GILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0308
Short Caption:THADDEUS L. GILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead: 86-CM-1716 Consolidated:89-CM-0308
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6794-86Filed Date:03/16/1989

Opening Event Date:03/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThaddeus Gilliams N
Elizabeth Tacy JesterYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GILLIAMS, THADDEUS L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/31/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE NOTE - 01 CONSOLIDATING NOS. 86-1716 AND NOTE - 02 89-308 FOR ALL PURPOSES. FO NOTE - 02 THAT ELIZABETH T. JESTER, ESQ. NOTE - 03 IS HEREBY APPTD TO REPRESENT NOTE - 03 APLT IN NO. 89-308 AND THAT NOTE - 04 CNSL IS DIRTD TO FILE THE DKTG NOTE - 04 STMT IN NO. 89-308 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 05 CON: 86-1716 NOTE - 05
03/16/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELIZABETH T. JESTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD DSA
04/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD CHECK
06/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD R
07/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD