judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANKS, EVERLEE G. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE

Case Information: 86-CV-0592
Short Caption:FRANKS, EVERLEE G. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MPA10-83Filed Date:03/24/1986

Opening Event Date:03/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/25/1986
Argued/Submitted:03/18/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Dorsey Evans YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Victor E. LongYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRANKS, EVERLEE G. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS
03/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/11/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/25/1986FiledBriefing Completed
03/18/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition