judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROGER H. CORLEY V. EDWIN MEESE III

Case Information: 86-SP-1088
Short Caption:ROGER H. CORLEY V. EDWIN MEESE IIIClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SP1023-86Filed Date:07/15/1986

Opening Event Date:07/15/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/07/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/18/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/13/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRoger H. Corley NPro SeN
RespondentEdwin Meese, IIIN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CORLEY, ROGER H. MEESE III, EDWIN
07/15/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/07/1986FiledRecord Completed
03/18/1987FiledBriefing Completed
04/13/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition